TN HB0050 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises to whom a promissory note may be issued in order not to be considered an investiment certificate under the Industrial Loan and Thrift Companies Act. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Title
As introduced, revises to whom a promissory note may be issued in order not to be considered an investiment certificate under the Industrial Loan and Thrift Companies Act. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/13/2013 |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2013-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0421 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0050&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0050.pdf |