TN HB0049 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from the sales and use tax all tangible personal property or services sold to a K-12 school or school support group during the first five temporary sales periods of a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, exempts from the sales and use tax all tangible personal property or services sold to a K-12 school or school support group during the first five temporary sales periods of a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0040 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee