TN HB0048 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, redirects the 80 percent portion of the tax revenue from the privilege tax on sports gaming from the lottery for education account to an account created for distribution to public school systems for the construction and maintenance of school buildings. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 3, relative to the disposition of taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021
2021-04-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to State Government Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-12-16HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1056 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback