TN HB0041 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a five-year period for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a five-year period for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-06-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018 |
2017-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0132 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017