TN HB0040 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the professional privilege tax for the tax year ending on May 31, 2020, and subsequent tax years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the professional privilege tax for the tax year ending on May 31, 2020, and subsequent tax years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0492 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 2/4/2020