TN HB0040 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Open Carry Firearms Freedom Act." - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Open Carry Firearms Freedom Act." - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] |
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Mark Lovell [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0147 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee