TN HB0037 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-21)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the state Alzheimer's disease and related dementia advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 14 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates the state Alzheimer's disease and related dementia advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 14 and Title 71.

Sponsors

Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]
Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]
Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 364
2019-04-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-01-19HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0028 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 364

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback