TN HB0036 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes from once every five years to once every four years the timeframe during which social workers, marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, pastoral counselors, alcohol and drug abuse counselors, and occupational therapists must complete an approved suicide prevention training program. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-125.
Title
As enacted, changes from once every five years to once every four years the timeframe during which social workers, marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, pastoral counselors, alcohol and drug abuse counselors, and occupational therapists must complete an approved suicide prevention training program. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-125.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 131 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0204 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 131