TN HB0035 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the Green Alert system within the TBI to assist in the identification and location of a missing veteran at risk. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the Green Alert system within the TBI to assist in the identification and location of a missing veteran at risk. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-01-23HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 1/30/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-01-19HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0001 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback