TN HB0033 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the words "husband," "wife," "mother," and "father" be given their natural and ordinary meaning, without forced or subtle construction that would limit or extend the meaning of the language and that are based on the biological distinctions between men and women, except when a contrary intention is clearly manifest. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, requires that the words "husband," "wife," "mother," and "father" be given their natural and ordinary meaning, without forced or subtle construction that would limit or extend the meaning of the language and that are based on the biological distinctions between men and women, except when a contrary intention is clearly manifest. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0030 (Crossfiled) 2017-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee