TN HB0030 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the acquisition or construction of a new correctional facility in Shelby County; requires the appointment of a committee to submit plans for such acquisition or construction to the board of control of the Tennessee corrections institute. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to local correctional facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-04-06 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Corrections Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Corrections Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Corrections Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-09 | House | Filed for introduction |