TN HB0030 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits certain incarcerated persons who are allowed to enroll in courses offered by a community college or Tennessee college of applied technology pursuant to an approved release plan to receive a Tennessee reconnect grant. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits certain incarcerated persons who are allowed to enroll in courses offered by a community college or Tennessee college of applied technology pursuant to an approved release plan to receive a Tennessee reconnect grant. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-01-18HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-01-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0299 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback