TN HB0023 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state board of education to make policies concerning the revocation of licenses and certificates for misconduct. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state board of education to make policies concerning the revocation of licenses and certificates for misconduct. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 304 | |
2015-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-01-15 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0341 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 304
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0023&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0023.pdf |