TN HB0020 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the home value for which real property tax relief will be granted from $100,000 to $175,000 for veterans with disabilities and from $23,500 to $25,000 for low-income homeowners who are elderly or have disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, changes the home value for which real property tax relief will be granted from $100,000 to $175,000 for veterans with disabilities and from $23,500 to $25,000 for low-income homeowners who are elderly or have disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-03 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee-- Finance, Ways & Means |
2017-01-12 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2017-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0023 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee