TN HB0018 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires coverage for refills of prescription eye drops in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As enacted, requires coverage for refills of prescription eye drops in certain situations. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 232 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2017 | |
2017-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0111) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-06 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0082) |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2017-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0051 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 232