TN HB0018 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates new criminal offense of aggressive driving; penalty is a Class B misdemeanor or, if intent is to injure another person, a Class A misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, creates new criminal offense of aggressive driving; penalty is a Class B misdemeanor or, if intent is to injure another person, a Class A misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-04 | Failed H., no const. maj., Ayes 37, Nays 54, PNV 6 | |
2009-05-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0305) | |
2009-05-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0081) | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/30/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-03-24 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Action Def. in s/c Public Safety of TR to 3/17/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-02-20 | Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Transportation | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2008-12-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1498 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-02 - Ref. to S. Trans. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0018&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0018.pdf |