TN HB0017 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a presumption that a minor who is the victim of a sexual offense or engaged in prostitution held a reasonable belief that the use of force is immediately necessary to avoid imminent death or serious bodily injury. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, establishes a presumption that a minor who is the victim of a sexual offense or engaged in prostitution held a reasonable belief that the use of force is immediately necessary to avoid imminent death or serious bodily injury. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0024 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee