TN HB0016 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Teacher's Discipline Act," which establishes requirements and procedures for teachers to discipline students in the teachers' classrooms, including relocation of a student. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the Teacher's Discipline Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06 Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
2021-04-06 Pub. Ch. 77
2021-03-31 Signed by Governor.
2021-03-23HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-03-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-18HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-03-18HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 87, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0016
2021-03-18HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-15HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/18/21
2021-03-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 8
2021-03-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0036)
2021-03-11SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-03-08HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 81, Nays 15, PNV 0
2021-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-08HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0001)
2021-03-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-10HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 2/17/2021
2021-02-09HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2021-02-03HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/9/2021
2021-02-03HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2021-01-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Education Administration
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2020-12-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0230 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 77

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback