TN HB0016 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, codifies the Acts of the 2018 regular session.
Title
As enacted, codifies the Acts of the 2018 regular session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1 | |
2019-02-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-01-31 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/4/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 1/31/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 1/30/2019 |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0022 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Pub. Ch. 1