TN HB0016 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows county legislative body by resolution to call for run-off election in event there is a tie for county or civil district office; makes it discretionary instead of mandatory for the county legislative body to cast the deciding vote for offices filled by the votes of a single county or civil district. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3 and Title 2, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, allows county legislative body by resolution to call for run-off election in event there is a tie for county or civil district office; makes it discretionary instead of mandatory for the county legislative body to cast the deciding vote for offices filled by the votes of a single county or civil district. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3 and Title 2, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449 |
2013-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-04-02 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to last calendar |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2013-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0026 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 449