TN HB0015 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to notify and cooperate with the law enforcement agency in the jurisdiction where the conduct occurred if it is reasonably foreseeable that conduct under investigation by the department will likely result in criminal prosecution. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to notify and cooperate with the law enforcement agency in the jurisdiction where the conduct occurred if it is reasonably foreseeable that conduct under investigation by the department will likely result in criminal prosecution. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0558 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0015&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0015.pdf |