TN HB0015 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts planning commission members of certain counties from filing statements of interests to Tennessee ethics commission. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts planning commission members of certain counties from filing statements of interests to Tennessee ethics commission. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-30HouseWithdrawn.
2013-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2013-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2013-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-01-10HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0027 (Crossfiled) 2013-01-31 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback