TN HB0014 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "School Stabilization Act"; requires, for the 2021-2022 school year, the BEP of each LEA to be calculated based on the LEA's 2019-2020 average daily membership (ADM), rather than the LEA's 2020-2021 ADM, unless the LEA's 2020-2021 ADM exceeds the LEA's 2019-2020 ADM. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the basic education program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseWithdrawn.
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-12-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0231 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-19 - Filed for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback