TN HB0013 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes certain restrictions on requiring persons to be vaccinated for the SARS-CoV-2 virus. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 68, relative to health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 1 & 3 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Pub. Ch. 513
2021-06-01 Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
2021-05-25 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-13HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-05-04HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA3 Ayes 83 Nays 7 PNV 0 HB0013
2021-05-04HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 83, Nays 7 PNV 0 HB0013
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/4/21
2021-04-29SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 21, Nays 8
2021-04-29SenateSenate adopted Amendment #3 - SA0427
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-28SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 2 - SA0421)
2021-04-28SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0201)
2021-04-28SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-21HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-21HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 19, PNV 0
2021-04-21HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0324)
2021-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0323)
2021-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
2021-04-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/13/2021
2021-03-18HouseReset on Final cal. of Health Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-10HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/10/2021
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2021
2021-02-16HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Health Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-11-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0187 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 513

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback