TN HB0010 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the Prospective Employee Credit Information Privacy Act, which prohibits an employer from failing or refusing to recruit or interview a prospective employee with respect to certain employment based on that person's credit information and creates a private cause of action for those injured due to violations by employers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, enacts the Prospective Employee Credit Information Privacy Act, which prohibits an employer from failing or refusing to recruit or interview a prospective employee with respect to certain employment based on that person's credit information and creates a private cause of action for those injured due to violations by employers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Potts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-02-05 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 2/5/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-12-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0034 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - Withdrawn.