TN HB0010 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the allocation of state or local public funds to the regulation or enforcement of any federal law, executive order, rule or regulation that becomes effective on or after January 1, 2013, that imposes restrictions on citizens who lawfully possess or carry firearms in this state; allows the allocation of state or local personnel or property to such regulation or enforcement if federal funding is provided. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the allocation of state or local public funds to the regulation or enforcement of any federal law, executive order, rule or regulation that becomes effective on or after January 1, 2013, that imposes restrictions on citizens who lawfully possess or carry firearms in this state; allows the allocation of state or local personnel or property to such regulation or enforcement if federal funding is provided. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Failed for Lack of Motion in: Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0040 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0010&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0010.pdf |