TN HB0007 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the child care expenditures of a candidate that are incurred by the candidate as a direct result of the candidate's participation in campaign-related events and activities. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the child care expenditures of a candidate that are incurred by the candidate as a direct result of the candidate's participation in campaign-related events and activities. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-01-10HouseRef. to Local Committee
2019-01-09HouseP2C held on desk.
2019-01-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-12-12HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback