TN HB0003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that a student's gender for purposes of participation in a public middle school or high school interscholastic athletic activity or event be determined by the student's sex at the time of the student's birth, as indicated on the student's original birth certificate. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school sports.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Tandy Darby [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 40 | |
2021-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/9/2021 |
2021-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0228 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/26/2021