TN HB0002 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Def. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes independent dispute resolution procedures for emergency services and balance bills. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to health care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseDef. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-16HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/23/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Insurance Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-11-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0001 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback