TN HB0002 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes motorcycles and motor-driven cycles to be operated on certain limited access highway and interstate shoulders to proceed to nearest exit when speed of traffic is 25 miles per hour or less. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55, Chapter 1 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, authorizes motorcycles and motor-driven cycles to be operated on certain limited access highway and interstate shoulders to proceed to nearest exit when speed of traffic is 25 miles per hour or less. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55, Chapter 1 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2017-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-11-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0465 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee