TN HB0001 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a healthcare provider from performing on a minor or administering to a minor a medical procedure if the performance or administration of the procedure is for the purpose of enabling a minor to identify with, or live as, a purported identity inconsistent with the minor’s sex. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 29; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 28; Title 29; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to medical care of the young.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1 | |
2023-02-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/16/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | |
2023-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/15/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/8/2023 |
2023-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/31/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-01-12 | House | Ref. to Health Committee -- Civil Justice Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-12-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-12-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-11-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-11-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-11-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0001 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023