SD SJR510 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 27. S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 27. S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To refer to the voters the question of whether this state should lower the state sales and use tax rate on food to zero percent, and to increase certain gross receipts tax rates, excise tax rates, and use tax rates.
Title
To refer to the voters the question of whether this state should lower the state sales and use tax rate on food to zero percent, and to increase certain gross receipts tax rates, excise tax rates, and use tax rates.
Sponsors
Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Sen. Liz Larson [D] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] |
Rep. Kameron Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 27. S.J. 260 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 182 |