SD SJR505 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, updating references to certain officeholders and persons.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, updating references to certain officeholders and persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 442 |
2023-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 489 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 417 |
2023-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 12. H.J. 402 |
2023-02-27 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 385 |
2023-02-24 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-02-24 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 248 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 204 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 204 Amendment SJR505A |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 6 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 137 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 126 |