SD SJR501 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-5)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-5)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the voters an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, providing for wagering on sporting events and to revise provisions regarding certain municipal proceeds of gaming revenues.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the voters an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, providing for wagering on sporting events and to revise provisions regarding certain municipal proceeds of gaming revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Adopt Resolution (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Adopt Resolution (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 450 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 498 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 421 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 27. H.J. 456 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 410 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | First Reading House H.J. 271 |
2020-02-11 | House | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 10. S.J. 191 |
2020-02-10 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 174 |
2020-02-07 | House | Local Government Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 119 |