SD SJR5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 22. S.J. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 22. S.J. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the authorization of certain games of chance in the City of Yankton.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the authorization of certain games of chance in the City of Yankton.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] |
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Rep. Kaleb Weis [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 22. S.J. 507 |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 457 |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 428 |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 400 |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 11. S.J. 385 |
2019-02-13 | House | State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 365 |
2019-02-13 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 5. |
2019-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 233 |