SD SCR8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-10)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 628
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requesting Congress to lawfully change the Medicaid eligibility requirements to give states the option to provide Medicaid services to persons in jail pending disposition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting Congress to lawfully change the Medicaid eligibility requirements to give states the option to provide Medicaid services to persons in jail pending disposition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Concurred in Resolution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 628
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 597
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 483
2019-02-21SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 454
2019-02-20SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 427
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 345

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback