SD SCR6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - House of Representatives Do Not Concur in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the President of the United States to make agricultural exports a priority and protect agricultural products from all current and future tariffs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the President of the United States to make agricultural exports a priority and protect agricultural products from all current and future tariffs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateHouse of Representatives Do Not Concur in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 390
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced H.J. 370
2019-02-11SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 330 Amendment c6jta
2019-02-11SenateSenate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0.
2019-02-11SenateSenate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 329 Amendment c6ja
2019-02-08SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 319
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-07SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 298
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 182
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced S.J. 151

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback