SD SCR5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Commending Senators John Thune and Mike Rounds for their votes to confirm Brett Kavanaugh's nomination to the United States Supreme Court, and wishing Associate Justice Kavanaugh well in his new role.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Senators John Thune and Mike Rounds for their votes to confirm Brett Kavanaugh's nomination to the United States Supreme Court, and wishing Associate Justice Kavanaugh well in his new role.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - House State Affairs Tabled (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25SenateState Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 183
2019-01-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 140
2019-01-16SenateSenate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 105
2019-01-16SenateSenate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 103 Amendment c5ja
2019-01-15SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced S.J. 71

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback