SD SB94 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise requirements relating to the publication of milk regulation ordinances.
Title
Revise requirements relating to the publication of milk regulation ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 24, 2021 S.J. 339 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 333 |
2021-02-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 367 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 332 |
2021-02-18 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-18 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 180 |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading House H.J. 166 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 136 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 95 |