SD SB93 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 637
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding instruction and restricted driving permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding instruction and restricted driving permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Transportation Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 637
2019-02-28HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 584
2019-02-28HouseTransportation Reconsidered, Passed
2019-02-28HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5.
2019-02-28HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. Amendment 93jj
2019-02-28HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 93jh
2019-02-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 392
2019-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 352
2019-02-12SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 352 Amendment 93jg
2019-02-08SenateTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 311
2019-02-08SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 93jc
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 166

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=93&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB93P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB93STR.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB93S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB93HTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27984&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28167&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29015&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29019&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29018&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29180&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback