SD SB92 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Require that certain proposed rules include a housing cost impact statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require that certain proposed rules include a housing cost impact statement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateSigned by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
2021-02-23SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 23, 2021 S.J. 328
2021-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 336
2021-02-18SenateSigned by the President S.J. 297
2021-02-17HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 305
2021-02-16HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-16HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 272
2021-02-09SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 225
2021-02-05SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-05SenateLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2021-02-05SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 92A
2021-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 95

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback