SD SB90 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-11)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding certain financial interest statements filed by persons elected to state or local office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding certain financial interest statements filed by persons elected to state or local office.

Sponsors

Sen. Ernie Otten [R]Sen. Rocky Blare [R]Sen. Jim Bolin [R]Sen. Gary Cammack [R]
Sen. Justin Cronin [R]Sen. Richard Curd [R]Sen. Lynn Disanto [R]Sen. Bob Ewing [R]
Sen. Red Foster [D]Sen. Brock Greenfield [R]Sen. Troy Heinert [D]Sen. Phil Jensen [R]
Sen. Craig Kennedy [D]Sen. Joshua Klumb [R]Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R]Sen. Kris Langer [R]
Sen. Ryan Maher [R]Sen. Jeff Monroe [R]Sen. Stace Nelson [R]Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D]
Sen. Al Novstrup [R]Sen. Jeff Partridge [R]Sen. Arthur Rusch [R]Sen. Lance Russell [R]
Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R]Sen. VJ Smith [R]Sen. Deb Soholt [R]Sen. Alan Solano [R]
Sen. Jim Stalzer [R]Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R]Sen. Billie Sutton [D]Sen. Jim White [R]
Sen. John Wiik [R]Sen. Susan Wismer [D]Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R]Rep. Kent Peterson [R]
Rep. David Anderson [R]Rep. Hugh Bartels [R]Rep. Doug Barthel [R]Rep. Arch Beal [R]
Rep. Scyller Borglum [R]Rep. Thomas Brunner [R]Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R]Rep. Roger Chase [R]
Rep. Fred Deutsch [R]Rep. Linda Duba [D]Rep. Mary Duvall [R]Rep. Caleb Finck [R]
Rep. Julie Frye-mueller [R]Rep. Bob Glanzer [R]Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R]Rep. Spencer Gosch [R]
Rep. Dayle Hammock [R]Rep. Jon Hansen [R]Rep. Jean Hunhoff [R]Rep. Kevin Jensen [R]
Rep. Timothy Johns [R]Rep. Chris Johnson [R]Rep. David Johnson [R]Rep. John Lake [R]
Rep. Paul Miskimins [R]Rep. Herman Otten [R]Rep. Tom Pischke [R]Rep. Peri Pourier [D]
Rep. Lee Qualm [R]Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R]Rep. Ray Ring [D]Rep. Tim Rounds [R]
Rep. Kyle Schoenfish [R]Rep. Jamie Smith [D]Rep. Manny Steele [R]Rep. Kelly Sullivan [D]
Rep. Nancy York [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 553
2019-02-25HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-25HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 514
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 292
2019-01-31SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 251
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-30SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 223
2019-01-30SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 165

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback