SD SB85 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the deadline for the Department of Health's annual report regarding abortions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the deadline for the Department of Health's annual report regarding abortions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 569
2019-02-26HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-26HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 548
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 371
2019-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 332
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-08SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 310
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 164

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback