SD SB84 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the possession and administration of opioid antagonists by school district and nonpublic school personnel, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the possession and administration of opioid antagonists by school district and nonpublic school personnel, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] |
Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] | Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R] |
Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] |
Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] |
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Sen. John Wiik [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] |
Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] |
Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] |
Rep. Manny Steele [R] | Rep. Kelly Sullivan [D] | Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678 |
2019-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 S.J. 630 |
2019-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 647 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 600 |
2019-02-28 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 550 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 556 Amendment 84bta |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 555 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 555 Amendment 84bd |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543 |
2019-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473 |
2019-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453 |
2019-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2019-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 398 |
2019-02-12 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 366 |
2019-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 329 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 284 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 284 Amendment 84xa |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 284 Amendment 84bc |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 265 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 222 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Health and Human Services Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 84ja |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 164 |