SD SB82 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain regulations pertaining to dealers of motor vehicles, boats, snowmobiles, or manufactured homes and mobile homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain regulations pertaining to dealers of motor vehicles, boats, snowmobiles, or manufactured homes and mobile homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateSigned by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
2021-02-23SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 23, 2021 S.J. 328
2021-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 336
2021-02-18SenateSigned by the President S.J. 297
2021-02-17SenateSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 277
2021-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 285
2021-02-09HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-02-09HouseTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-02-09HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 82C
2021-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 180
2021-02-01SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 144
2021-01-27SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-01-27SenateTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-01-27SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 82B
2021-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 82

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback