SD SB78 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2023 S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2023 S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create the South Dakota Board of Physical Therapy and make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Create the South Dakota Board of Physical Therapy and make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2023 S.J. 472 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2023 S.J. 409 |
2023-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 446 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 372 |
2023-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 393 |
2023-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 374 |
2023-02-23 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 223 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 179 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 76 |