SD SB71 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2022 S.J. 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2022 S.J. 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to the partners in education tax credit program.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to the partners in education tax credit program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2022 S.J. 230 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 04, 2022 S.J. 181 |
2022-02-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 199 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 156 |
2022-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 23. H.J. 171 |
2022-01-31 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. |
2022-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 56 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 5. S.J. 84 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 71A |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 12 |