SD SB71 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit capital punishment of any person with severe mental illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit capital punishment of any person with severe mental illness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateSenate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 372
2019-02-12SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 363
2019-02-12SenateJudiciary Reconsidered, Passed
2019-02-11SenateRecalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed S.J. 330
2019-02-07SenateJudiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 299
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 155

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback