SD SB69 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Correct certain provisions with incorrect cross references regarding county road district boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correct certain provisions with incorrect cross references regarding county road district boundaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateSigned by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
2021-02-04SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 04, 2021 S.J. 182
2021-02-03HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 186
2021-02-02SenateSigned by the President S.J. 160
2021-02-01HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 167
2021-01-28HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-28HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 109
2021-01-21SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 88
2021-01-20SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 1
2021-01-20SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-01-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback