SD SB67 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to emergency and involuntary commitment for alcohol and drug abuse.
Title
Revise provisions related to emergency and involuntary commitment for alcohol and drug abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Stevens [R] | Sen. Erin Tobin [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Sydney Davis [R] |
Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Rep. Scott Moore [R] | Rep. Brian Mulder [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Rep. Jess Olson [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Taylor Rehfeldt [R] | Sen. Michael Rohl [R] |
Rep. William Shorma [R] | Rep. Tyler Tordsen [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2023 S.J. 467 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 517 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 456 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 445 |
2023-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 435 |
2023-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 434 Amendment 67G |
2023-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416 |
2023-02-27 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. |
2023-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 212 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 168 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 167 Amendment 67F |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 166 Amendment 67B |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 152 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 137 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 67A |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 55 |